NH HB1530 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-01 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/23/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206
Pending: House Children and Family Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-10-01 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/23/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206
Pending: House Children and Family Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to oversight of guardians ad litem by the guardian ad litem board.
Title
Relative to oversight of guardians ad litem by the guardian ad litem board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-01 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/23/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-08-17 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/28/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-08-01 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/16/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-06-07 | House Referred to Children and Family Law for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2432 | |
2012-03-07 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1337 | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Mar 7 (Vote 12-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1080 | |
2012-02-15 | House Executive Session: 2/23/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-02-09 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/16/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-01-31 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 ==RECESSED== | |
2012-01-11 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/26/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-01-11 | House ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 1/12/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2011-12-13 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 7, PG. 359 |