NH HB1530 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-10 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 180-162; House Journal 16, PG.752
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-10 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 180-162; House Journal 16, PG.752
Summary
Redefining earnable compensation of members of the New Hampshire retirement system.
Title
Redefining earnable compensation of members of the New Hampshire retirement system.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Hawkins [R] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 180-162; House Journal 16, PG.752 | |
2010-02-03 | House Minority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study; House Calendar 13, PG.536 | |
2010-02-03 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 10 Regular Calendar (vote 12-5); House Calendar 13, PG.536 | |
2010-01-27 | House Executive Session: 2/2/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-01-27 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/29/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-01-27 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/28/2010 8:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-01-21 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/27/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-01-21 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/26/2010 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-01-06 | House Public Hearing: 1/20/2010 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 6, PG.243 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2567&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |