NH HB1525 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a county nursing home capital reserve fund.
Title
Establishing a county nursing home capital reserve fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-02 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/26/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-12-09 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Ways and Means |