NH HB1523 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a New Hampshire child care fund.
Title
Establishing a New Hampshire child care fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2022 1:15 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/26/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2022 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-12-09 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |