NH HB1522 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Lay HB1522 on Table (Rep. B. Sullivan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Lay HB1522 on Table (Rep. B. Sullivan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to weekly benefit amounts for unemployment compensation.
Title
Relative to weekly benefit amounts for unemployment compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Lay HB1522 on Table (Rep. B. Sullivan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/14/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-01-24 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-01-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 1 P. 23 |