NH HB152 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 197-124 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 197-124 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the threshold for reporting by political committees.
Title
Increasing the threshold for reporting by political committees.
Sponsors
Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Peter Torosian [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Dave Testerman [R] |
Rep. Max Abramson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 197-124 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 58 |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-02-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 29 |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 39 |