NH HB1517 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 43; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 43; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to vehicle inspection failures for rust.
Title
Relative to vehicle inspection failures for rust.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 43; Eff. 1/1/2019 |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 56 |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 33 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-24 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/09/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 48 |