NH HB1516 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Raising the minimum age for marriage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Raising the minimum age for marriage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 207 N: 132 NV: 19 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Limit Debate (Y: 213 N: 133 NV: 12 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 136 N: 209 NV: 13 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 208 N: 137 NV: 13 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 113 N: 230 NV: 15 Abs: 38) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - House - Table (Y: 128 N: 209 NV: 20 Abs: 39) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseReconsider (Rep. T. Smith): Motion Failed DV 115-221 03/11/2020
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1142h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-132 03/11/2020
2020-03-11HouseFLAM # 2020-1127h (Rep. Horn): Amendment Failed DV 135-211 03/11/2020
2020-03-11HouseFLAM # 2020-1125h (Rep. Horn): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 136-209 03/11/2020
2020-03-11HouseFLAM # 2020-1142h (Rep. Levesque): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 208-137 03/11/2020
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-1085h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 113-230 03/11/2020
2020-03-11HouseLay on Table (Rep. Edwards): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 128-209 03/11/2020
2020-03-04HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-03-04HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1085h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 34
2020-02-19HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2020-02-12HousePublic Hearing: 02/18/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206 (exec. session may follow public hearing schedule)
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 25

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2424&sy=2020&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1516
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&id=1562&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2020&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1562
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=80&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1516&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1516&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2424
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=81&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1516&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1516&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2424
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=82&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1516&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1516&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2424
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=83&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1516&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1516&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2424
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=84&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1516&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1516&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2424
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=85&sy=2020&lb=H&eb=HB1516&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2020&txtbillnumber=HB1516&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2424

Bill Comments

feedback