NH HB1513 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the commissioner of the department of health and human services to study the conversion of the Medicaid program to block grant funding and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Requiring the commissioner of the department of health and human services to study the conversion of the Medicaid program to block grant funding and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Mark Pearson [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Mark McLean [R] |
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 59 |
2020-02-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0001h |
2020-02-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 15-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 21 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 25 |