NH HB1513 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the New Hampshire Law Enforcement Officers Memorial Association to issue decals for multi-use decal plates.
Title
Authorizing the New Hampshire Law Enforcement Officers Memorial Association to issue decals for multi-use decal plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/12/2018; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 15 |
2018-01-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 16 |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 01/18/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 13 |