NH HB151 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Retained in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the definition of "agriculture."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of "agriculture."

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06HouseRetained in Committee
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback