NH HB151 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-11 - Veto Sustained: Regular Calendar 184-154 Lacking the Necessary Two-Thirds Vote; House Journal 46, PG. 1985-1987
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study end-of-life decisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study end-of-life decisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-11 - House - Veto Override (Y: 184 N: 154 NV: 14 Abs: 47) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-11HouseVeto Sustained: Regular Calendar 184-154 Lacking the Necessary Two-Thirds Vote; House Journal 46, PG. 1985-1987
2015-06-03HouseVetoed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; House Journal 46, PG. 1985
2015-05-13HouseEnrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1779
2015-05-13SenateEnrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14
2015-04-30SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12
2015-04-17Senate=== RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; Senate Calendar 19
2015-04-15Senate=== CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/23/15; Senate Calendar 18
2015-03-19SenateHearing: 3/24/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14
2015-03-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8
2015-03-04HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 189-161; House Journal 22, PG. 595
2015-02-20HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2015-02-20HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 4 (Vote 9-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 359
2015-02-12House==RESCHEDULED== Continued Executive Session: 2/12/2015 Legislative Office Building 208
2015-02-11House==CANCELED== Continued Executive Session: 2/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2015-02-04HouseExecutive Session: 2/4/2015 12:45 PM Legislative Office Building 208 ==RECESSED==
2015-01-14HousePublic Hearing: 1/20/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG. 209

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback