NH HB1509 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting spending of special education moneys for any other purpose and requiring reporting of fund balances to the school board.
Title
Prohibiting spending of special education moneys for any other purpose and requiring reporting of fund balances to the school board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 P. 5 |
2024-02-29 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 02/20/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2024 09:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 104 |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 01/31/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/30/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 1 |