NH HB1509 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to emergency threat protection orders for individuals at post secondary educational institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to emergency threat protection orders for individuals at post secondary educational institutions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-19HouseFull Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow
2020-02-19HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 45
2020-02-13HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/19/2020 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 19
2020-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2020-01-28HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback