NH HB1504 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 263-45 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study prohibiting recreational trapping.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study prohibiting recreational trapping.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 263-45 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 105
2020-03-04HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2020-03-04HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 56
2020-02-18House==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 03/10/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307
2020-02-05HousePublic Hearing: 02/18/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 1 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback