NH HB1504 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-95
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-95
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that life begins at conception.
Title
Providing that life begins at conception.
Sponsors
Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - House - ITL (Y: 214 N: 95 NV: 41 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-95 |
2014-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2014-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/04/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-02-12 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/20/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing: 2/13/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary |