NH HB1501 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-26 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/16/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
Pending: House Resources, Recreation and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-26 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/16/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305
Pending: House Resources, Recreation and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a fund to upgrade wastewater treatment plants.
Title
Establishing a fund to upgrade wastewater treatment plants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-26 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/16/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-06-07 | House Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2433 | |
2012-03-07 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1320-1321 | |
2012-02-21 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Mar 7 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1075 | |
2012-02-08 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-02-03 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/14/2012 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-02-01 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/2/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-01-12 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 1/31/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-01-12 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/25/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-12-22 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 1/12/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-12-01 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 7, PG. 358 |