NH HB150 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/23/2021; Chapter 4; Eff: 04/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/23/2021; Chapter 4; Eff: 04/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Making a technical correction and a clarification in the law governing death benefits for emergency medical technicians and rescue squad members.
Title
Making a technical correction and a clarification in the law governing death benefits for emergency medical technicians and rescue squad members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 04/23/2021; Chapter 4; Eff: 04/23/2021 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 04/08/2021); Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-12 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 99 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/25/2021; Senate Journal 9 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/25/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/17/2021, 10:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 8 |
2021-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 5 |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/92995497899 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 37 |