NH HB150 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the legalization, regulation, and taxation of marijuana.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the legalization, regulation, and taxation of marijuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/23/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 3/31/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0347h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 842-843 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0347h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 842-843 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0347h (NT) for Mar 11 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 416 |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-02-04 | House | ==CANCELED== Executive Session: 2/4/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 1/20/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 209 |