NH HB1497 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricting trial courts in criminal matters from imposing certain sentences following a plea bargain.
Title
Restricting trial courts in criminal matters from imposing certain sentences following a plea bargain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 10 |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/06/2024 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 02/14/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 22 |