NH HB149 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB149
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the handling of requests made under the right-to-know law.
Title
Relative to the handling of requests made under the right-to-know law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 60 |
2023-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB149-FN 11/08/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 16 |
2023-09-26 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-09-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/15/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 40 |
2023-09-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-05-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB149 (Carry Over) 2023-05-17 - Full Committee Work Session: 06/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208