NH HB1484 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 73; Eff. 7/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to late fees in manufactured housing parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to late fees in manufactured housing parks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 73; Eff. 7/24/2018
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15
2018-05-01HouseEnrolled 04/26/2089
2018-04-19SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 16Y-6N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-20SenateHearing: 04/11/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0761h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 69
2018-03-06HouseAmendment # 2018-0761h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 69
2018-02-27HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2018-02-27HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0761h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 37
2018-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 302
2018-02-14HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2018-02-07HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2018 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 302
2017-11-03HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 12

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback