NH HB1483 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to allowing dogs in outdoor dining areas of restaurants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to allowing dogs in outdoor dining areas of restaurants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0946h (NT): Motion Adopted DV 208-125 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 122
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0946h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 122
2020-03-05HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0946h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 39
2020-02-20HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-02-13HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback