NH HB1483 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - House III. Remainder Effective 07/01/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - House III. Remainder Effective 07/01/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the retirement system special account and repealing the assessments for excess benefits paid by employers in the retirement system.
Title
Repealing the retirement system special account and repealing the assessments for excess benefits paid by employers in the retirement system.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Hawkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-16 - Senate - Senator D'Allesandro Floor Amendment 2234s (Y: 4 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - OTP/AM 0091H (Y: 209 N: 97 NV: 39 Abs: 52) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - OTP/AM 0091H (Y: 209 N: 97 NV: 39 Abs: 52) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | House III. Remainder Effective 07/01/2012 | |
2012-06-22 | House II. Section 15, 16, 18 Effective 06/18/2012 | |
2012-06-22 | House I. Section 4&17 Effective as Provided in Section 18 | |
2012-06-22 | House Signed By Governor 06/18/2012; Chapter 0261 | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2012-2488e Adopted; House Journal 51, PG.2610-2611 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2488e Adopted | |
2012-05-30 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2326s(NT) (Rep Hawkins): Motion Adopted Division Vote 226-82; House Journal 47, PG.2503 | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 2326s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Sen. D’Allesandro Floor Amendment #2012-2334s, Regular Calendar 4Y-18N, Amendment Failed | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2012-2326s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Sen. Bradley Moved Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Sen. Groen Moved Laid On Table, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 12, Pg.445 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Ought to Pass Not Voted On | |
2012-04-26 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/2/12; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2012-04-04 | Senate Hearing: 4/12/12, Room 100, State House, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9, Pg.334 | |
2012-03-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0091h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 209-97; House Journal 26, PG.1619-1621 | |
2012-03-15 | House Amendment #0091h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.1618-1619 | |
2012-02-22 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 19, PG.1139 | |
2012-02-22 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2012-0091h; House Calendar 19, PG.1176 | |
2012-02-22 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0091h for Mar 7 (Vote 11-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19, PG.1139 | |
2012-02-09 | House Executive Session: 2/17/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306-308 | |
2011-12-14 | House Public Hearing: 1/6/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201-203 | |
2011-11-28 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Special Committee on Public Employee Pensions Reform; House Journal 7, PG. 357 |