NH HB1480 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-130 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-130 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of system benefits charges.
Title
Relative to the use of system benefits charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - ITL (Y: 201 N: 130 NV: 33 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 201-130 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 33 |
2020-02-20 | House | Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-02-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 36 |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 23 |