NH HB1469 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1285-1286
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1285-1286
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to enforcement of parenting plans.
Title
Relative to enforcement of parenting plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1285-1286 | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 12-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1054-1055 | |
2012-01-31 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-01-11 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/26/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2012-01-03 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 1/19/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2011-11-22 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 7, PG. 356 |