NH HB1455 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9, Pg.337
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9, Pg.337
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to special licenses for taking lobster while engaged in recreational scuba diving.
Title
Relative to special licenses for taking lobster while engaged in recreational scuba diving.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9, Pg.337 | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/11/12; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2012-03-23 | Senate Hearing: 3/29/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7, Pg.187 | |
2012-02-22 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0780h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1206 | |
2012-02-22 | House Amendment #0780h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1206 | |
2012-02-16 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-0780h; House Calendar 14, PG.840-841 | |
2012-02-16 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0780h for Feb 22 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14, PG.802 | |
2012-02-03 | House Executive Session: 2/14/2012 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2012-02-02 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/14/2012 8:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 | |
2012-01-19 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/2/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2012-01-03 | House Public Hearing: 1/17/2012 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-11-22 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources; House Journal 7, PG. 356 |