NH HB1453 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - Lay HB1453 on Table (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed DV 190-184 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-28 - Lay HB1453 on Table (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed DV 190-184 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 128
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to degree granting authority of certain institutions of higher education.
Title
Relative to degree granting authority of certain institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Lay HB1453 on Table (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed DV 190-184 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 128 |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/11/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 26 |
2024-03-06 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/11/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-15 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/20/2024 09:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-05 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2024 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 21 |