NH HB1453 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 173; Eff. 8/2/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 173; Eff. 8/2/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to qualifying medical conditions for purposes of therapeutic cannabis.
Title
Relative to qualifying medical conditions for purposes of therapeutic cannabis.
Sponsors
Rep. David Luneau [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Mary Wallner [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 89 N: 257 NV: 27 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 173; Eff. 8/2/2016 |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/12/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Hearing: 04/19/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:20 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 03/10/2016 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-10 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 136 |
2016-03-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 89-257 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 134 |
2016-02-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass House Calendar 14 P. 55 |
2016-02-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 9-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 55 |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 01/26/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2016 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building205 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 4 P. 15 |