NH HB1452 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-111; House Journal 21, PG.1254-1257
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-111; House Journal 21, PG.1254-1257
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the establishment of sobriety checkpoints.
Title
Prohibiting the establishment of sobriety checkpoints.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - House - ITL (Y: 226 N: 111 NV: 26 Abs: 34) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-111; House Journal 21, PG.1254-1257 | |
2012-02-15 | House Special Order to End of Next Week's Regular Calendar: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.967 | |
2012-02-15 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Lambert); House Journal 16, PG.909 | |
2012-02-06 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 15 (Vote 12-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1050 | |
2012-01-03 | House Public Hearing: 2/2/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2011-11-22 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 7, PG. 356 |