NH HB1449 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the requirements for filing a charter school application.
Title
Relative to the requirements for filing a charter school application.
Sponsors
Rep. June Frazer [D] | Rep. Mary Gorman [D] | Rep. Rachel Burke [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] |
Rep. Anne Grassie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Hearing: 4/10/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services |
2014-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0779h Motion Adopted Div 180-112 |
2014-03-12 | House | Amendment #2014-0779h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0779h (Vote 14-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-03-05 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/6/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 2/20/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207=RECESSED= |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/11/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-02-04 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/4/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/4/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2014-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2014 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Education |