NH HB1447 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to child support paid through the department of health and human services.
Title
Relative to child support paid through the department of health and human services.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Tamburello [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Oligny [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Tammy Simmons [R] |
Rep. Joe Duarte [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 29 |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 25-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 19 |
2016-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2016 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building210-211 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Finance House Journal 4 P. 15 |