NH HB1442 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/17/2020; Chapter 18; Eff: 09/15/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/17/2020; Chapter 18; Eff: 09/15/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Gunstock area commission and ski resort.
Title
Relative to the Gunstock area commission and ski resort.
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Howard [R] | Rep. Glen Aldrich [R] | Rep. Harry Bean [R] | Rep. Barbara Comtois [R] |
Rep. Deanna Jurius [R] | Rep. John Plumer [R] | Rep. Charlie St. Clair [D] | Rep. Michael Sylvia [R] |
Sen. James Gray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/17/2020; Chapter 18; Eff: 09/15/2020 |
2020-07-10 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71 |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Sen. French Moved Ought to Pass; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Without Objection, take up at the present time, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted, 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Sen. French Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 19 |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 13 |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 01/29/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 22 |