NH HB1442 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 7/14/2014; Chapter 0222; Effective Date 7/14/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 7/14/2014; Chapter 0222; Effective Date 7/14/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to mental health courts.
Title
Relative to mental health courts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-18 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/14/2014; Chapter 0222; Effective Date 7/14/2014. |
2014-05-28 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/15/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Hearing: 4/29/14, Room 100, State House, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0451h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-06 | House | Adopt Amendment #0451h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0451h (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/6/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary |