NH HB1441 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.920
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.920
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing the requirement for the reporting of incidents by emergency medical services providers and units.
Title
Removing the requirement for the reporting of incidents by emergency medical services providers and units.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Proulx [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.920 | |
2012-02-09 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 15 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.686 | |
2011-12-14 | House Public Hearing: 1/24/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2011-11-22 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 7, PG.355 |