NH HB143 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB143
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Veto Overridden 09/13/2018: Eff. 09/13/2018; Chapter 378
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Veto Overridden 09/13/2018: Eff. 09/13/2018; Chapter 378
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to recommittal of a prisoner by the parole board.
Title
Relative to recommittal of a prisoner by the parole board.
Sponsors
Rep. John Sytek [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-13 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - House - Veto Override (Y: 255 N: 89 NV: 18 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - House - Veto Override (Y: 255 N: 89 NV: 18 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | House | Veto Overridden 09/13/2018: Eff. 09/13/2018; Chapter 378 |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall HB 143 Become Law: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Veto Overridden by necessary two-thirds vote; 09/13/2018; Senate Journal 19 |
2018-09-13 | House | Veto Overridden 09/13/2018: Regular Calendar 255-89 by Required Two-Thirds Vote |
2018-04-02 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 03/30/2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 03/21/2018); Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-21 | House | Enrolled 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 61 |
2018-03-15 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 0028s (Rep. Welch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 29 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0028s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2018-0028s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2017-2544s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Remove HB 143 from the Consent Calendar; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2544s, 01/03/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/31/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 25 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to refer HB 143 back to Judiciary, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Remove HB 143 from the Consent Calendar; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/20/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-01-26 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/26/2017 House Journal 4 P. 3 |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/26/2017 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 8 P. 3 |
2017-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/17/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 18 |
Same As/Similar To
HB143 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18