NH HB143 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to electric renewable energy classes.
Title
Relative to electric renewable energy classes.
Sponsors
Rep. David Murotake [R] | Rep. Eric Eastman [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Carl Seidel [R] |
Rep. Jack Flanagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 49 |
2015-07-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 10 |
2015-06-24 | House | Executive Session: 6/30/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-06-16 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/30/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-05-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED==Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/2/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-05-26 | House | ==CANCELED==Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/2/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-02-17 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Representatives Hall |
2015-01-22 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Representatives Hall |
2015-01-14 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 12, PG. 209 |