NH HB143 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0067
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0067
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the sale of stove polish.
Title
Relative to the sale of stove polish.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0067 | |
2011-05-04 | House Enrolled; House Journal 42, PG.1490 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 16, Pg.318 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 13, Pg.270 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13, Pg.261 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/20/11; Senate Calendar 20 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Hearing: 4/12/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce | |
2011-02-09 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0139h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.310 | |
2011-02-09 | House Amendment #0139h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.310 | |
2011-02-03 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0139h; House Calendar 12, PG.227 | |
2011-02-03 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0139h for Feb 9 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 12, PG.200 | |
2011-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-25 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/1/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-13 | House Public Hearing: 1/19/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-11 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 174 |