NH HB1426 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-03 - Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 22
Pending: House Resources, Recreation and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring an off highway recreational vehicle club to have certain tests performed on a rail trail prior to use as an OHRV trail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring an off highway recreational vehicle club to have certain tests performed on a rail trail prior to use as an OHRV trail.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 22
2020-03-11HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020
2020-03-05HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 27
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2020-01-14HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2020 11:45 am Legislative Office Building 201-203

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback