NH HB1422 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 94
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating an exemption from the business profits tax for new businesses in New Hampshire.
Title
Creating an exemption from the business profits tax for new businesses in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Estevez [R] | Rep. Eric Eastman [R] | Rep. Richard Marston [R] | Rep. Charlene Takesian [R] |
Rep. John Manning [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 94 |
2016-03-09 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Estevez) 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 3 |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 45 |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/11/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building202 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 4 P. 13 |