NH HB1421 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the equalization rate used for the calculation of a property tax abatement by the New Hampshire board of tax and land appeals, the superior court, and all cities, towns, and counties.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the equalization rate used for the calculation of a property tax abatement by the New Hampshire board of tax and land appeals, the superior court, and all cities, towns, and counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0705h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 56 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-0705h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 56 |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0705h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 25 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-02-05 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2020 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 21 |