NH HB1421 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 39; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the regulation of event tents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the regulation of event tents.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 39; Eff. 1/1/2019
2018-04-19HouseEnrolled 04/19/2018
2018-04-18SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13
2018-04-05SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11
2018-03-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Senate Calendar 15
2018-03-14SenateHearing: 03/21/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 13
2018-03-13SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0849h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 34
2018-03-06HouseAmendment # 2018-0849h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 34
2018-02-28HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0849h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 19
2018-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 02/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 306
2018-02-21House==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 308
2018-02-21House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2017-11-03HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 10

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback