NH HB1413 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Hearing: 05/01/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 17
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:15 am in Room 101, Legislative Office Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Hearing: 05/01/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 17
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:15 am in Room 101, Legislative Office Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to mental health supervision agreements.
Title
Relative to mental health supervision agreements.
Sponsors
Rep. Alicia Gregg [D] | Rep. Katelyn Kuttab [R] | Rep. Gaby Grossman [D] | Rep. Frances Nutter-Upham [D] |
Rep. Shelley Devine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Hearing: 05/01/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1076h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-1076h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1076h 03/13/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 15 |
2024-03-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/13/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 |