NH HB1413 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 289-47 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 289-47 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to privacy of online customer information.
Title
Relative to privacy of online customer information.
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Wuelper [R] | Rep. Linda Gould [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] | Rep. Scott Wallace [R] |
Rep. Dave Testerman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 289-47 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 17-1; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-03 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2022 1:15 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-02-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/02/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/24/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2022 10:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |