NH HB1403 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N; === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N; === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a state minimum hourly wage.
Title
Establishing a state minimum hourly wage.
Sponsors
Rep. Sara Kelly [D] | Sen. Sylvia Larsen [D] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Chris Muns [D] |
Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Mary Knowles [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - OTP (Y: 173 N: 118 NV: 56 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - Adopt FLAM 14-0969h (Y: 95 N: 199 NV: 53 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - Table (Y: 115 N: 179 NV: 53 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - OTP (Y: 173 N: 118 NV: 56 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - Adopt FLAM 14-0969h (Y: 95 N: 199 NV: 53 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - Table (Y: 115 N: 179 NV: 53 Abs: 41) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N; === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 12 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/8/14; Senate Calendar 17 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 4/22/14, Room 103, State House, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance |
2014-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 173-118 |
2014-03-12 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-0969h (Rep. Infantine) Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 95-199 |
2014-03-12 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Kapler) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 115-179 |
2014-03-12 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-0969h (Rep. Infantine) |
2014-03-12 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-0730h Amendment Failed Div 65-227 |
2014-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2014-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/11/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2013-12-17 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |