NH HB1400 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-20 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/30/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201
Pending: House Public Works and Highways Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-20 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/30/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201
Pending: House Public Works and Highways Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing the department of transportation to sell naming rights for certain structures.
Title
Allowing the department of transportation to sell naming rights for certain structures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-20 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/30/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2012-09-20 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/2/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2012-09-13 | House Interim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 9/20/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2012-06-07 | House Referred to Public Works and Highways for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2433 | |
2012-02-01 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 13, PG.786 | |
2012-01-25 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Feb 1 (Vote 13-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 5, PG.253 | |
2011-12-21 | House Public Hearing: 1/17/2012 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2011-11-22 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 7, PG.354 |