NH HB1394 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-23 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-23 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensure and regulation of music therapists.
Title
Relative to licensure and regulation of music therapists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 195 N: 187 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - OTPA (Y: 194 N: 186 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - OTPA (Y: 194 N: 186 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Special Order to 05/23/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/22/2024 Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/22/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 20A |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Hearing: 05/08/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Hearing: 05/08/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:20 am, on proposed non-germane amendment # 2024-1740s; Senate Calendar 18 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Introduced 04/11/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1141h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-187 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 43 |
2024-04-11 | House | Amendment # 2024-1141h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 P. 43 |
2024-03-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-03-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1141h (NT) 03/26/2024 (Vote 15-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 11 |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/19/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-02-28 | House | Division Work Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 109 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0399h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-186 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 107 |
2024-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2024-0399h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 105 |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/07/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) |
2024-02-02 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/07/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-31 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 18 |