NH HB1388 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 196; 01/01/2023 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 196; 01/01/2023 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the unsolicited disclosure of an intimate image.
Title
Relative to the unsolicited disclosure of an intimate image.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/17/2022; Chapter 196; 01/01/2023 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Abbas): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1676s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1676s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1676s, 04/28/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Hearing: 03/15/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 01/21/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2022 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |