NH HB1388 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to testing for Lyme disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to testing for Lyme disease.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20HouseExecutive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205
2018-09-20HouseInterim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/27/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building205
2018-02-22HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 13
2018-02-09HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/22/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 10
2018-01-26HouseExecutive Session: 01/25/2018 Legislative Office Building 205
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2017-11-06HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 9

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback