NH HB1386 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Signed by the Governor on 5/23/2014; Chapter 0025; Effective 7/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-27 - Signed by the Governor on 5/23/2014; Chapter 0025; Effective 7/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the minutes of county proceedings.
Title
Relative to the minutes of county proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on 5/23/2014; Chapter 0025; Effective 7/22/2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/17/14; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Hearing: 3/19/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |
2014-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0348h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-05 | House | Adopt Amendment #0348h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0348h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Municipal and County Government |